SAHIL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somalia
Governance
- 13 September 2006: Standard registration
- 04 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, UNEMPLOYMENT AND HEALTH ISSUES FOR PEOPLE IN THE SAHIL REGION (SOMALILAND, EAST AFRICA) PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT, AND PROVIDING RESOURCES AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENTS.
Area of benefit
SAHIL REGION (SOMALILAND, EAST AFRICA)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window