FOSS (FRIENDS OFFERING SUPPORTIVE SOLUTIONS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have supported 8 local families this year having received requests from Surestart and the Food bank. Funds have been raised this year by way of 3 planned events along with the generous income gratefully received monthly from a kind donor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 February 2007: Standard registration
- 08 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FOSS (FRIENDS OFFERING SUPPORTIVE SOLUTIONS) (Working name)
- FLEETWOOD TOUCH (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF SURE START (FOSS) (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF SURE START (FOSS) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £724 | £928 | £1.27k | £655 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £181 | £456 | £500 | £495 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 12 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 07 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 03 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 09 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF FAMILIES IN THE AREA BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO RESOURCES IN AREAS OF DEPRIVATION. 3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG THOSE, IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN IN SUCH CIRCUMSTANCES. 4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF FLEETWOOD THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OF FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 5) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
FLEETWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window