Financial history SPARKLE SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1126583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £54.25k £86.53k £88.33k £106.89k £91.83k
Total expenditure £49.64k £80.03k £87.45k £83.03k £116.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A