Trustees HARLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1115777

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil David Irwin Campbell | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Martin | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Iliffe Harris | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Sherwin | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Elizabeth Jackson | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Michael Bonser | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gina Maria Bonser | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ANDREW MARTIN | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Trenberth | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Edwards | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAMIAN MICHAEL DEVER | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
TINA KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD EDWARD CORBETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.