SHIELDS PARLIAMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving people with learning disabilities in Southend a voice that is used to help shape future services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 06 February 2007: Standard registration
- SHIELDS PARLIMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL Anthony WOODBRIDGE | Chair | 10 November 2011 |
|
|||||
David Taylor | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jane Sexton | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Stepney | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.01k | £9.01k | £6.00k | £6.02k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.22k | £10.98k | £11.68k | £11.76k | £8.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
3 THE OBJECTS. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (A) TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WHO HAVE LEARNING DISABILITIES (B) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY INCLUDING PROFESSIONALS AND SERVICE PROVIDERS ABOUT DISABILITY MATTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT GEOGRAPHICALLY DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SOUTHEND ON SEA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Argyll Road
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
Essex
SS0 7HL
- Phone:
- 01375370460
- Email:
- info@shieldsparliament.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window