NEW DOCKLANDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our core activities are the support to the New Docklands Steam Baths, which in turn provides a focus point for the regular users and to the local community for a range of support in various forms such as information resource, empowerment opportunities, social engagement, community projects, job seekers training and specific grant giving considerations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 02 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Alan Woudstra | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY SHAPIRO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.25k | £97.81k | £109.53k | £65.74k | £10.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.79k | £93.77k | £36.03k | £58.14k | £168.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 September 2024 | 632 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2022
(These accounts |
20 September 2024 | 632 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 June 2024 | 913 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2021
(These accounts |
28 June 2024 | 913 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 16 April 2020 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 16 April 2020 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
3.1 TO FURTHER SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS; 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON DOCKLANDS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS; 3.3 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON DOCKLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO PROVIDE OR PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON DOCKLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEAM BATHS
30A STEPHENSON STREET
LONDON
E16 4SA
- Phone:
- 07970838635
- Email:
- new.docklands@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window