SOCIAL INVESTMENT BUSINESS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SIB FOUNDATION INVESTS IN COMMUNITY BASED ORGANISATIONS RUNNING ENTERPRISE ACTIVITIES. WE PROVIDE FINANCE SUCH AS LOANS, GRANTS AND EQUITIES AS WELL AS SUPPORT AND ADVICE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£69,549,000
Donations and legacies | £468.00k | |
Charitable activities | £58.68m | |
Other trading activities | £7.67m | |
Investments | £2.21m | |
Other | £527.00k |
Total expenditure:
£69,416,000
Raising funds | £844.00k | |
Charitable activities | £57.68m | |
Other | £10.89m |
-£879,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £310,128 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £57.68m | |
Retained for future use | £133.00k |
People

72 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 December 2006: Standard registration
- ADVENTURE CAPITAL FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonali Siriwardena | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debjani Ghosh | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Magdalene Akosua Foda Bayim- Adomako | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Barnard | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Keyte | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Wallis | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Dosanjh-Elton | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hewitt | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50m | £9.54m | £9.07m | £22.55m | £69.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.12m | £17.62m | £10.56m | £29.99m | £69.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £763.00k | £631.00k | £123 | £336.47k | £310.13k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £325.00k | £181.00k | £468.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.23m | £2.50m | £1.28m | £4.80m | £7.67m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.19m | £5.24m | £5.12m | £15.57m | £58.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £325.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.75m | £1.50m | £2.01m | £1.60m | £2.21m | |
|
Income - Other | £324.00k | £296.00k | £344.00k | £398.00k | £527.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £181.00k | £468.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.26m | £5.42m | £5.12m | £15.61m | £57.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £7.97m | £534.00k | £7.00m | £844.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £356.00k | £407.00k | £592.00k | £558.00k | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.86m | £4.24m | £4.91m | £7.38m | £10.89m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £11.50m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £39.69m | £37.91m | £33.28m | £39.26m | £39.98m | |
|
Other assets | £26.82m | £28.76m | £38.35m | £18.30m | £17.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.37m | £28.56m | £22.61m | £14.46m | £15.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/04/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/05/2015 as amended on 28 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ALL PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: SUPPORTING COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS IN AREAS OF SOCIAL NEED THAT ARE CHARITIES AND THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF OTHER COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING BY PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE; AND/OR THE MAKING AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INVESTMENTS BY MEANS OF LOANS, GRANTS, GUARANTEES, EQUITY, NEAR EQUITY OR OTHER FINANCIAL INTERVENTIONS OR ASSISTANCE TO CHARITIES OR FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORTING COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN AREAS OF SOCIAL NEED; AND/OR PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES BY THOSE CHARITIES AND FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ADVICE, SUPPORT AND RELATED ASSISTANCE TO CHARITIES AND FOR CHARITABLE PROJECTS IN RELATION TO SUCH LOANS, GRANTS, GUARANTEES, EQUITY, NEAR EQUITY OR OTHER FINANCIAL INTERVENTIONS AND SOCIAL INVESTMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
Arc House
82 Tanner Street
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02030967903
- Email:
- enquiries@sibgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window