PELVIC PAIN SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide information, support and advocacy for those with pelvic pain, their families and carers. We deliver educational workshops about pelvic pain for health professionals and the general public. We promote research into the impact of pelvic pain on quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrine Petersen | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Canwell | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lydia Carney | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miznah Al-Abbadey | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Burns | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN JANE MARTINDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA HOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER Merriman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £1.32k | £782 | £731 | £4.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £470 | £1.97k | £3.13k | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 22 Feb 2012
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING WITH PELVIC PAIN, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE PUBLIC, BY RAISING AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO PELVIC PAIN AND ITS TREATMENTS. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH THROUGH APPROPRIATE INSTITUTIONS TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING FOR PATIENTS WITH PELVIC PAIN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 STOURPAINE ROAD
POOLE
BH17 9AT
- Phone:
- 01202 604749
- Email:
- info@pelvicpain.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window