MOTHERLESS CHILDREN FOUNDATION OF AFRICA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Nigeria
- Somalia
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
- 19 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
RELIEF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR MOTHERLESS AND ORPHANED CHILDREN IN THE THIRD WORLD, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY NIGERIA, ZAIRE, UGANDA AND SOMALIA, BY PROVISION OF FUNDS, CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS, SPONSORSHIPS AND IMPROVED RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NIGERIA, ZAIRE, UGANDA AND SOMALIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window