THE FRIENDS OF MOYSE'S HALL MUSEUM AND ASSOCIATED COLLECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE SPONSOR LECTURES AND OTHER EVENTS AND SUPPORT THE MUSEUM IN ANY WAY WE CAN. IN JUNE 2010 WE PRODUCED 300 BOOKLET'S CALLED 'PERFECT ARRANGEMENTS IN TIME' ABOUT FREDERIC GERSHOM-PARKINGTON (1886-1952) WHO BEQEATHED ONE OF THE COUNTRY'S MOST IMPORTANT CLOCK AND TIMEPIECE COLLECTION TO THE TOWN OF BURY ST. EDMUNDS. IN PAST 12 MONTHS WE ENABLED & CONTRIBUTED TO PURCHASE OF ITEMS FOR THE MUSEUM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 September 2006: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF MOYSE'S HALL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE MANOR HOUSE AND MOYSE'S HALL MUSEUMS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUGLAS BEARDON | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Buchanan | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ben Booth | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Steve Jones | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Charlesworth | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|||||||
Cllr Diane Hind | Trustee | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
||||||
JEREMY PATRICK HOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARTIN LIGHTFOOT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.87k | £7.79k | £696 | £1.03k | £3.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £518 | £1.26k | £5.26k | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2005. 11 JUNE 2007 AND 20 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MANOR HOUSE AND MOYSE'S HALL MUSEUMS ('THE MUSEUMS') AND THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF HOROLOGY, ART, COSTUME, LOCAL HISTORY, MILITARIA, ETC IN COOPERATION WITH ITS MANAGEMENT AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SUFFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Appledown Drive
Bury St. Edmunds
IP32 7HG
- Phone:
- 07890198957
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window