SUTTON CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Relief to the poor and needy Help and comfort to the sick and aged
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
81 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sutton
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY JOHN HORSWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
OLUSEYI OLUYEMI OBAKIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MICHAEL AMECHI IKWUEMESI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.68k | £194.19k | £189.08k | £181.78k | £161.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.08k | £154.40k | £161.46k | £168.34k | £165.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.30k | £800 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 September 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 September 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 January 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 January 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS; 2) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION; 3) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; 4) THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED; AND 5) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Hillside Road
Cheam
Sutton
SM2 6ET
- Phone:
- 02082860872
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window