NEWCASTLE VISION SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newcastle Vision Support supports 1,300 people living with sight loss. Our numbers grow by 100 new referrals each year. To our service users NVS provides vital support enabling clients to overcome the devastating effects of sight loss. Services provided include - outreach, volunteer visiting, training (including IT training places to 60 clients per year), a resource centre and much more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
- 21 February 2023: Funds received from 1168009 EYE WISH ACCESS CIO
- NEWCASTLE SOCIETY FOR BLIND PEOPLE (Previous name)
- NEWCASTLE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND PEOLPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Davies MBE | Chair | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Buckley | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Laborte | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
lesley Rance | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Deas | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Pages | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Deas | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CAROLINE GOODFELLOW | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.32k | £124.30k | £69.32k | £156.89k | £236.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.70k | £178.83k | £185.22k | £161.69k | £244.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.00k | £36.62k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 4 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 MAR 0207
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT CALCULATED TO MEET THEIR NEEDS - PROVIDED THAT SUCH SUPPORT WILL BE GIVEN IN A WAY WHICH INCREASES AND RESPECTS THE INDEPENDENCE, CHOICE, PRIVACY AND DIGNITY OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
6th Floor west A
Hadrian House
Higham Place
Newcastle Upon Tyne
- Phone:
- 01912327292
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window