TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Townswomen's Guilds (TG) acts as an umbrella organisation for the national movement. It provides administrative frameworks and works to promote the movement across the UK by assisting in the formation of new Guilds and in the recruitment of new members. It provides national events to bring members together, a magazine to link members and campaigns on matters that make women's lives better .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 August 2006: Standard registration
- 07 April 2021: Funds received from 1083926 ECCLESALL (A) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
- 21 September 2021: Funds received from 1083965 SHEFFIELD CHAPELTOWN & ECCLESFIELD (A) TOWNSWOMEN'...
- 18 March 2022: Funds received from 1085507 THE SOUTHAMPTON THORNHILL AND BITTERNE TOWNSWOMEN'...
- 06 January 2023: Funds received from 1083722 BRIDLINGTON (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
- 18 July 2024: Funds received from 1096474 THE BRIDGEMARY TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
- 24 April 2025: Funds received from 1082931 BIGGLESWADE IVEL E TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Stebbings | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Lewis | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Howells | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mavourneen Moore | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Brown | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERYL LESLEY HALES | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376.53k | £309.40k | £242.42k | £256.37k | £221.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £721.25k | £650.44k | £499.02k | £442.47k | £320.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS IS FORMED FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD AND TO DEVELOP THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING; TO EDUCATE PEOPLE, BUT IN PARTICULAR WOMEN, ON THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE; TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING FOR CREATIVE AND PERFORMANCE ARTS AND CRAFTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR WOMEN BUT ALSO FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND VOLUNTEERING SO THAT PEOPLE BECOME ACTIVE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Townswomens Guilds
Gee House
Holborn Hill
BIRMINGHAM
B7 5JR
- Phone:
- 01213260400
- Email:
- contact@the-tg.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window