Financial history BRIGHTON FRINGE LTD

Charity Number: 1116367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £400.29k £371.48k £527.37k £438.54k £306.71k
Total expenditure £566.31k £303.27k £450.33k £441.41k £338.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.50k £115.76k £138.52k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £26.84k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £500.49k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £43 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £392.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £57.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A