Accounts and annual returns INTEGRATED WATER RESOURCES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1118297
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required