THE CITY LAMBETH & SOUTHWARK MUSIC EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPENING A WORLD OF MUSIC IN THE THREE BOROUGHS. OUR AIM IS TO BRING THE PLEASURE OF MUSIC TO THOSE WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE THE OPPORTUNITY. WE CURRENTLY RUN A VIOLIN PROJECT IN LAMBETH AND SOUTHWARK WHICH WE HOPE TO EXPAND SOON. WE HAVE MANY OTHER PROJECTS IN THE PIPELINE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 26 July 2007: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 November 2012: Re-registered
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16k | £1.26k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 October 2012 | 630 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 9 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE MUSICAL EDUCATION IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH AND SOUTHWARK, FOR THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND ADULTS WHO HAVE HAD NO FORMAL MUSICAL EDUCATION, BY; 1 PROVIDING AND ENGAGING IN MUSICAL EDUCATION AND INVOLVING CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN MUSICAL ACTIVITIES AND PROJECTS 2 ASSISTING WITH THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE HISTORIC PIPE ORGANS IN ST GEORGE THE MARTYR, SOUTHWARK AND ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WATERLOO.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window