GLOBAL COOL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Cool Foundation runs campaigns to promote low-carbon lifestyles. We specifically acknowledge that many people are not interested in climate etc. and therefore our campaigns focus on the benefits of green lifestyle choices to the individual. These can be the fun, adventure and cost benefits. We use social networking, fashion and music to reach and inspire people to change their behaviours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2006: Standard registration
- 14 June 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GLOBAL COOL FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.19k | £5.31k | £32.00k | £829 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.73k | £56.80k | £91.83k | £46.87k | £9.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 25 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 01 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 01 July 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 27 MAY 2009, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
(3.) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (3.1) THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING THE REDUCTION OF GREENHOUSE GASES; (3.2) TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND TO PUBLISH AND WIDELY DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window