CROOKHAM ROVERS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of participation in healthy recreation, particularly by the playing of football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANDREW TRICE | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHEAL JOHN HOPE | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES BURTON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.66k | £38.64k | £44.33k | £51.41k | £70.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.82k | £37.17k | £53.17k | £52.60k | £54.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
BEING PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN CROOKHAM, ARE AS FOLLOWS: 2.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL. 2.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE CHILDREN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CROOKHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kilfinnan
Church Grove
FLEET
GU51 4LA
- Phone:
- 07929060605
- Email:
- philjburton@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window