KINDER MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saving lives in wild and remote places. We provide a 365 days a year, 24/7 search and mountain rescue service to walkers and climbers in the Dark Peak, as well as assisting the police with lowland search and rescue of vulnerable persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £935 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Wild | Chair | 25 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Joseph William Heighway | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Elford Lee | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Tiffany | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Harries | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Howarth | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Johnson | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Cotton | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Pratt | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Eustace | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.56k | £68.20k | £85.80k | £139.24k | £67.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.19k | £52.63k | £43.99k | £47.89k | £50.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.93k | N/A | N/A | £935 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIFE AND ALLEVIATE DISTRESS, PRIMARILY IN UPLAND AND MOUNTAINOUS AREAS BY UNDERTAKING SEARCH AND RESCUE WHEN REQUESTED BY THE POLICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coach House Farm
Castle Edge Road
New Mills
HIGH PEAK
Derbyshire
SK22 4QF
- Phone:
- 999
- Email:
- secretary@kmrt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window