HILLVIEW EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fulfilling aims of the Charity through a planned programme of activities by Hillview Church and Abbey Church - these can be seen on the website for each church, www,hillviewchurch.net and abbeychurch.net.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN JOHN MORTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brian Cathcart Bruce | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Maxted | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ducker | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dancy | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN GRANT | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.30k | £238.30k | £130.54k | £126.08k | £165.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.96k | £223.96k | £116.74k | £127.43k | £160.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULES HERETO IN HUCCLECOTE IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST B) RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C) TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
HUCCLECOTE IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillview Evangelical Church
26 Colwell Avenue
Hucclecote
GLOUCESTER
GL3 3LX
- Phone:
- 01452618485
- Email:
- office@hillviewchurch.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window