SECOND CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of this church is to spread and maintain the teachings of Christian Science as found in the Bible, 'Science and Health with Key to the Scriptures' by Mary Baker Eddy, the Discoverer and Founder of Christian Science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 29 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCOISE ANDRE | Chair |
|
||||||||
PHILIP WYLIE | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
"TO SPREAD AND MAINTAIN THE TEACHINGS OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE AS FOUND IN THE BIBLE, IN THE CURRENT EDITION OF SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES, BY MARY BAKER EDDY, THE DISCOVERER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE, AND TO MAINTAIN THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE IN ANY MANNER WHICH SHALL BE CHARITABLE AT LAW AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE SECOND CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SECOND CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST
104 PALACE GARDENS TERRACE
LONDON
W8 4RT
- Phone:
- 02072292682
- Email:
- clerk@secondchurchlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window