AXENTIS MICHAEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund Raising is mainly carried out via a Charitable Ball in memory of Axentis Michael
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £25,590 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Demetriou | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KERRY MICHAEL | Trustee |
|
||||||
SOPHIA MICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA DEMETRIOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELE MICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.36k | £861 | £30 | £1.18k | £26.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.52k | £45.64k | £46.98k | £71.28k | £177.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 May 2021 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 May 2021 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMCT
37-40 Alexandra Parade
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS23 1QZ
- Phone:
- 01934836624
- Email:
- amct@agmholdings.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window