CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE EAST DEVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The bureau is established for the purpose of benefiting the community in East Devon (the area of benefit) a) by advancing the education of the public in the matters relating to mental, physical and social welfare. b) by relieving poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £153,114 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 30 August 2006: Standard registration
- EAST DEVON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Boyd | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gordon Ward | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Duffy | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Victor Holme | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Whelan | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.90k | £388.27k | £303.02k | £379.14k | £273.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.68k | £221.68k | £320.62k | £299.81k | £212.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.00k | N/A | N/A | £160.14k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £128.71k | £132.30k | £195.52k | £126.51k | £153.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MAY 2006 null as amended on 25 Jan 2022 as amended on 09 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
Objects 4. The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in East Devon and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Exeter Road
EXMOUTH
Devon
EX8 1QD
- Phone:
- 01395 265 070
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window