Accounts and annual returns VOLUNTEER CENTRE BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE

Charity number: 1125184
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 April 2025 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 April 2025 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window