Financial history VOLUNTEER CENTRE BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE

Charity number: 1125184
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £277.39k £371.92k £313.78k £461.93k £646.81k
Total expenditure £252.63k £318.08k £348.24k £435.91k £615.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £224.23k £300.09k £118.08k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £39.52k £159.13k £344.31k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £907
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £645.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £903
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £603.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0