Trustees VOLUNTEER CENTRE BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE
Charity number: 1125184

Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Orme | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY LUCAS | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jovanka Humble | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Smith MBE | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jacques | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.