AN-NISA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing public education and awareness on Islam, Muslims and the Islamic perspective; equality of opportunity, community cohesion and harmony; economic and social development of the community; promoting the voluntary sector; Advancing education and training and the provision of facilities for education, health, arts and culture, recreation with the object of improving conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 February 2007: Standard registration
- 29 April 2022: Funds received from 1143863 INTERNATIONAL ISLAMIC RELIEF ORGANISATION (UK)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SABA RAHMAN SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMINA HAJJAJ THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUMERA KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.18k | £7.14k | £6.56k | £7.40k | £5.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £9.27k | £9.26k | £7.81k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS ACCEPTED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY BY: 3.1 ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS ON ISLAM, MUSLIMS AND THE ISLAMIC PERSPECTIVE (TO THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND IN INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES) SO AS TO ENCOURAGE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, COMMUNITY COHESION AND HARMONY, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING, TOLERANCE AND RESPECT; 3.2 ENCOURAGING OR CONTRIBUTING TO THE ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND B Y DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 3.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROVISION AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, HEALTH, ARTS AND CULTURE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED; 3.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Syed Accountants Ltd
10 Courtenay Road
East Lane
WEMBLEY
Middlesex
HA9 7ND
- Phone:
- 07766827970
- Email:
- info@an-nisa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window