YOGA FOR HEALTH AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of Yoga for people of all abilities through the provision of regular inclusive events. To provide quality Continuing Professional Development (CPD) events for qualified Yoga teachers to enable them to have the confidence to teach people of all abilities. To provide access to Yoga therapy events through the provision of organised events in accessible venues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Cosserat | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ansty | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Williams | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON FRANCIS | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUNE ANNE SKEGGS | Trustee | 21 May 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.35k | £3.34k | £5.26k | £24.63k | £26.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.12k | £5.54k | £4.29k | £28.44k | £50.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CLASSICAL TEACHING, PHILOSOPHY AND PRACTICE OF YOGA AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT EXCLUSIVE TO: A) PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF, AND RESEARCH INTO, THE THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS OF YOGA AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH: B) PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOGA, INCLUDING ESTABLISHING A CENTRE, THUS PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE TO ASSOCIATE TOGETHER IN A NON-COMPETITIVE ENVIRONMENT TO PRACTICE YOGA AND IMPROVE THEIR SELF-ESTEEM AND SELF-AWARENESS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 Spencer Road
RUSHDEN
Northamptonshire
NN10 6AD
- Phone:
- 07931905230
- Email:
- admin@yhet.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window