Trustees THE SHERWOOD FOREST TRUST
Charity number: 1119614
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Mottishaw | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Paul Carlton | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy Jeffcutt | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erin Crowe | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Malcolm Peck | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lucy Hackett | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Evelyn Turner | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Rowland Hill | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Statham | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Carl Cornish | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BEALBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.