Financial history NOVOUK LTD

Charity number: 1115959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £335.14k £381.72k £416.01k £416.28k £486.63k
Total expenditure £352.76k £400.13k £400.33k £425.45k £1.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A