Accounts and annual returns CARNEGIE HERITAGE ACTION TEAM

Charity Number: 1118716
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 18 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 21 August 2008 On Time