Accounts and annual returns OUR CHILL OUT LIMITED

Charity number: 1116885
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 06 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 06 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 16 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 16 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 14 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 11 March 2009 On Time