Accounts and annual returns POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK BRISTOL CHURCH

Charity number: 1122469
Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2023 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late Download Open in new window