THE FARRINGTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to relieve poverty, distress and suffering through access to education,health and the advancement of religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIRAN NATHWANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAREN NATHWANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.75k | £15.00k | £13.63k | £14.45k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.51k | £14.38k | £9.90k | £16.86k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO MAKE DONATIONS OR GRANTS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS. B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING LITERACY AND OTHER BASIC LEARNING SKILLS. C) TO PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN AND OTHER ESSENTIAL AID TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR MEDICAL AND OTHER SIMILAR AIDE TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS AND; D) TO ADVANCE RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Farrington Place
Northwood
HA6 3SW
- Phone:
- 02089072777
- Email:
- paren@farringtoncare.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window