Financial history MULTISTORY

Charity number: 1116214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £310.20k £305.94k £392.28k £425.55k £513.04k
Total expenditure £456.46k £255.48k £356.94k £407.50k £499.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £66.19k £130.19k £108.85k
Income from government grants £113.04k £114.17k £114.17k £257.57k £102.75k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £264
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £163.53k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.13k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £346.11k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £499.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0