CLWB PELDROED IEUENCTID BETHEL

Charity Number: 1118107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Darparu hyfforddiant peldroed ar gyfer plant a phobl ifanc y pentref a'r dalgylch. Bydd timau'r Clwb yn cymryd rhan yng nghyngrair peldroed Gwynedd.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £20,798
Total expenditure: £24,913

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

There is no trustee information available for this charity

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.49k £8.35k £21.65k £17.07k £20.80k
Total expenditure £6.01k £5.70k £16.92k £12.89k £24.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.62k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 February 2025 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 February 2025 644 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 February 2025 1009 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1479 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1479 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Clwb Peldroed Bethel
Cae Top Bethel
Bethel
Caernarfon
Gwynedd
LL55 3AA
Phone:
00000000000