Financial history HACKNEY ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1117069
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.12k £6.70k £38.98k £67.12k £165.37k
Total expenditure £10.25k £5.37k £37.92k £58.89k £175.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A