HACKNEY ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has issued an official warning Open in new window
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to advance the Islamic faith for public benefit by maintaining and managing a community centre and mosque, fostering an environment for worship, religious instruction, community engagement and activities. Additionally, we support the education of Muslim children and adults through a supplementary school, offering educational and recreational facilities outside school and work hours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 29 November 2006: Standard registration
- An-Nawawi Center (Previous name)
- An-Nawawi Centre (Previous name)
- DARUL-MUSTAFA TRUST (Previous name)
- Masjid an-Nawawi (Previous name)
- Masjid Imam an-Nawawi (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibrahim Saeed Mohamed | Chair | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Osman Ahmed | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hakiim Kiggundu Kamulegeya | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £6.70k | £38.98k | £67.12k | £165.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.25k | £5.37k | £37.92k | £58.89k | £175.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
12 April 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2022 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED ON 27 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED ON 03 SEP 2022 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAY 2024 as amended on 01 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MOSQUE, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN BY PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Elba House
2 Andre Street
LONDON
E8 2FL
- Phone:
- 07955162245
- Email:
- info@masjidimamannawawi.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window