HOPE SURVIVORS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) The promotion of the mental and moral improvement of mankind by commemorating and remembering the victims of genocides. In particular but not exclusively the genocide committed in Rwanda in 1994; 2) The relief of survivors who are in conditions of poverty, sickness and distress by provision of advice on health, housing, education and social issues or by providing grants;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rwanda
Governance
- 14 March 2007: Standard registration
- IBUKA (UK) MEMORY AND JUSTICE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN LOUIS MAZIMPAKA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARTHE UWERA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC MUHIRWA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEN SESOUNGA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £6.80k | £7.35k | £9.11k | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.70k | £6.40k | £6.80k | £8.50k | £8.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 2007 AND 4 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF MANKIND BY COMMEMORATING AND REMEMBERING THE VICTIMS OF GENOCIDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE GENOCIDE COMMITTED IN RWANDA IN 1994; 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SURVIVORS OF THE GENOCIDE COMMITTED IN RWANDA IN 1994 RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY: A) THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON HEALTH, HOUSING, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL ISSUES OR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS; B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Cranwood Court
Vince Street
London
EC1V 9HD
- Phone:
- 07947951114
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window