Accounts and annual returns CARE AND COMFORT COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity number: 1117127
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 03 November 2015 On Time