Quba Islamic Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES, EDUCATION. ADVISE AND SUPPORT, RECREATIONAL SERVICES, HEALTH PROMOTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 January 2007: Standard registration
- ASWED (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION FOR SOMALI WELFARE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
- MASJID AL QUBA (MARKEZ QUBA ISLAMIC CENTRE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abubakar Jama Egal | Chair | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdishakuur Mohamed Osman | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hamza Jama Egal | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Jama Egal | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abduraxman Jama Egal | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.02k | £148.29k | £96.32k | £107.27k | £183.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.45k | £85.88k | £136.93k | £106.95k | £172.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DEC 2006 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2016 as amended on 27 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SOMALIA AND THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE UK; C) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quba Islamic Centre
19 Brunswick Street
LEICESTER
LE1 2LP
- Phone:
- 07544495153
- Website:
-
qubamasjid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window