Financial history NEWCLOSE COUNTY CRICKET GROUND LIMITED

Charity Number: 1117675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £140.45k £33.04k £48.06k £56.14k £53.58k
Total expenditure £77.24k £39.82k £72.40k £68.90k £109.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A