THE GEOFFREY BRIDGEMAN CENTRE OF RESTORATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing advice, support, information and advocacy for people with mental health problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- St Lucia
Governance
- 07 November 2006: Standard registration
- 09 February 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/08/2011 | 17/08/2012 | 17/08/2013 | 17/08/2014 | 17/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £300 | £6.16k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £210 | £171 | £4.51k | £50 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 August 2015 | 17 October 2016 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 August 2014 | 23 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, IN PARTICULAR ALL FORMS OF MENTAL ILLNESS, AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH TO PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND TRAINING TO THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, MENTAL HEALTH CARERS AND MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. THE CARIBBEAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window