Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCHING AND APPLYING METAPHOR (RAAM)

Charity number: 1119686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required