Financial history THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCHING AND APPLYING METAPHOR (RAAM)

Charity number: 1119686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £3.65k £9.03k £9.47k £8.20k £8.72k
Total expenditure £2.40k £1.37k £1.42k £3.56k £11.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A