Accounts and annual returns GAUNTS HOUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1120688
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 13 June 2018 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 12 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required