Financial history GAUNTS HOUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1120688
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £440.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £437.59k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A