GAUNTS HOUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a place of Profound Learning, where like-minded people can come together to share experiences, teach, laugh, play, and flourish. We aim to provide a comfortable environment with an open atmosphere such that visitors may feel inspired to seek their inner self and their own path to follow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 29 August 2007: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE RICHARD GLYN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE RICHARD GLYN FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £440.69k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £437.59k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 31 July 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 13 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 13 June 2018 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 12 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MAY 2006. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 20 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE FIELDS OF RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY, PSYCHOLOGY AND SOCIOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window