Accounts and annual returns CYMDEITHAS GYMUNEDOL LLANNEWYDD / NEWCHURCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1116158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required