Financial history ROTHWELL TEMPERANCE BAND

Charity number: 1116173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £17.59k £13.63k £4.48k £38.21k £54.33k
Total expenditure £16.96k £14.47k £4.20k £37.82k £54.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A